skip to content

Robinson, Jessica Ann

CPSO#: 88561

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 30 Oct 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Oct 2013

Summary

Former Name: Lefort, Jessica Ann (used until: 06 Nov 2013 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
10 Angeline Street North
Lindsay ON  K9V 5B7
Phone: (705) 324-6111 Electoral District: 06

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Jessica Robinson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 29 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Robinson ( CPSO# 88561 )

Business Address:
Ross Memorial Hospital
10 Angeline Street North
Lindsay ON  K9V 4M8
Phone Number: (705) 324-6111

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ross Memorial Hospital Lindsay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 09 Sep 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. JESSICA ANN ROBINSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROBINSON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 26 Sep 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 27 Sep 2010 to 26 Sep 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 27 Sep 2011 to 11 Mar 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 12 Mar 2012 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2012 to 13 Sep 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 14 Sep 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2013 to 13 Sep 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 13 Sep 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Oct 2013