THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 11:14:57 AM
Robinson, Jessica Ann
CPSO#:
88561
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
30 Oct 2013
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Oct 2013
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
Lefort, Jessica Ann (used until: 06 Nov 2013 )
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 2008
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
10 Angeline Street North
Lindsay ON K9V 5B7
Phone: (705) 324-6111
Electoral District: 06
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Ross Memorial Hospital |
Lindsay |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:09 Sep 2013 |
CFPC Specialist |
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) |
Effective:15 Oct 2018 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JESSICA ANN ROBINSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROBINSON is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 26 Sep 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery
University of Ottawa, 27 Sep 2010 to 26 Sep 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery
University of Ottawa, 27 Sep 2011 to 11 Mar 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 12 Mar 2012 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2012 to 13 Sep 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 14 Sep 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2013 to 13 Sep 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2008 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 13 Sep 2013 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Oct 2013 |