skip to content

Roberts, George Raymond Tregson

CPSO#: 29106

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 11 Aug 2016
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 04 Sep 2015

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Creole, English

Education:University of Newcastle-Upon-Tyne, 1969

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



United Kingdom

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Hematological Pathology Effective:25 Nov 1976 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Oct 1972
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jun 1977
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 25 Oct 1993
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Feb 1999
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 04 Sep 2015
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 04 Sep 2015
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 11 Aug 2016

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: September 4, 2015
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the voluntary cease-to-practise Undertaking given by Dr. George Raymond Tregson Roberts to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective September 04, 2015:

Dr. Roberts has ceased to practise medicine due to retirement and therefore cannot see any patients or provide any medical advice or services.