THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
23/04/24 5:31:06 AM
Roberts, George Raymond Tregson
CPSO#:
29106
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of
11 Aug 2016
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
04 Sep 2015
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Creole, English
Education: Newcastle University Faculty of Medical, 1969
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
United Kingdom
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Hematological Pathology |
Effective:25 Nov 1976 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 16 Oct 1972 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 02 Jun 1977 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 25 Oct 1993 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 09 Feb 1999 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 04 Sep 2015 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 04 Sep 2015 |
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership |
Expiry: 11 Aug 2016 |
Concerns
Source:
Member
Active Date: September 4, 2015
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the voluntary cease-to-practise Undertaking given by Dr. George Raymond Tregson Roberts to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective September 04, 2015:
Dr. Roberts has ceased to practise medicine due to retirement and therefore cannot see any patients or provide any medical advice or services.