skip to content

Ripley, Michael David

CPSO#: 96846

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jul 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective:30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist
Gynecologic Reproductive Endocrinology/Infertility Effective:21 Sep 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 03 Oct 2011 to 21 Oct 2011
EL - Gynecologic Reproductive Endocrinology/Infertility

University of Ottawa, 28 Nov 2011 to 16 Dec 2011
EL - Gynecologic Reproductive Endocrinology/Infertility

University of Ottawa, 09 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 6 - Gynecologic Reproductive Endocrinology/Infertility

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 08 Jul 2014
PostGrad Yr 6 - Gynecologic Reproductive Endocrinology/Infertility

University of Ottawa, 09 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 7 - Gynecologic Reproductive Endocrinology/Infertility

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Oct 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 21 Oct 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 28 Nov 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 16 Dec 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2015