THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 8:26:11 AM
Ripley, Michael David
CPSO#:
96846
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of
30 Jun 2015
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
01 Jul 2013
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 2008
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Obstetrics and Gynecology |
Effective:30 Jun 2013 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Gynecologic Reproductive Endocrinology/Infertility |
Effective:21 Sep 2015 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 03 Oct 2011 to 21 Oct 2011
EL - Gynecologic Reproductive Endocrinology/Infertility
University of Ottawa, 28 Nov 2011 to 16 Dec 2011
EL - Gynecologic Reproductive Endocrinology/Infertility
University of Ottawa, 09 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 6 - Gynecologic Reproductive Endocrinology/Infertility
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 08 Jul 2014
PostGrad Yr 6 - Gynecologic Reproductive Endocrinology/Infertility
University of Ottawa, 09 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 7 - Gynecologic Reproductive Endocrinology/Infertility
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 03 Oct 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 21 Oct 2011 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 28 Nov 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 16 Dec 2011 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2013 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2015 |