skip to content

Richardson, Beverley J

CPSO#: 26438

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 24 Dec 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 13 May 1974

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1972

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Robert M.A. Richardson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 4 2015

Medical Records Location

Address: Patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical record may contact: Box 161 27 St Clair Avenue East Toronto ON M4T 2L7, or Health Records Department Women's College Hospital 76 Grenville Street Toronto ON M5S 1B1
Instructions: Medical records prior to November 2011 are stored at the St Clair Avenue East address. Records after November 2011 are stored at the Women's College Hospital address.
Date Received: 12 Jan 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:01 Jan 1977 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 May 1974
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 24 Dec 2015