THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 22:03:13 PM
Richardson, Beverley J
CPSO#:
26438
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
24 Dec 2015
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
13 May 1974
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1972
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Robert M.A. Richardson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 4 2015
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Medical records prior to November 2011 are stored at the St Clair Avenue East address. Records after November 2011 are stored at the Women's College Hospital address.
Patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical record may contact:
Box 161
27 St Clair Avenue East
Toronto ON M4T 2L7, or
Health Records Department
Women's College Hospital
76 Grenville Street
Toronto ON M5S 1B1
Date Received: 12 Jan 2015
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:01 Jan 1977 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 13 May 1974 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 24 Dec 2015 |