skip to content

Nahas, Richard

CPSO#: 72330

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 23 Jun 2001
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 13 Jul 2018
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English, French, Spanish

Education:University of Toronto, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
942 Merivale Road
Ottawa ON  K1Z 5Z9
Phone: (613) 727-7246
Fax: (613) 727-7247 Electoral District: 07

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Richard Nahas Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 25 2003

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Nahas ( CPSO# 72330 )

Business Address:
942 Merivale Road
Ottawa ON  K1Z 5Z9
Phone Number: (613) 727-7246

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Jun 2001 CFPC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Apr 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Apr 2001
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2001
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 13 Jul 2018
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Inquiries, Complaints and Repo Effective: 13 Jul 2018
Terms and conditions amended by Inquiries, Complaints and Repo Effective: 17 May 2019

Pending Hearings Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Summary:

Allegations of Dr. Naha’s professional misconduct have been referred to the Discipline Committee of the College. It is alleged that Dr. Nahas sexually abused Patient A and engaged disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct towards Patient A during a medical appointment in approximately November 2016, including by touching her body, including her genital area, in a manner that was sexual and/or inappropriate, by breaching boundaries, and by making inappropriate remarks and remarks of a sexual nature towards Patient A.


Notice of Hearing: Download Full Notice (PDF)

Hearing Date(s): Motion: July 4, 2019 Hearing: November 4-7, 2019

Practice Restrictions Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee Effective: 17 May 2019 Active
             As from 12:01 a.m., May 17, 2019, by order of the Inquiries, Complaints and
            Reports Committee of the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, the
            following terms, conditions and limitations are imposed on the certificate of
            registration held by Dr. Richard Nahas:

            (i)   Dr. Nahas shall not perform manipulation, mobilization or massage of the
                  soft tissues and joint structures, including but not limited to
                  myofascial release ("manual therapy"), acupuncture, or injections of any
                  kind (the "Professional Encounter") on patients of any age in any
                  jurisdiction, unless the Professional Encounter takes place in the
                  continuous presence of and under the continuous observation of a monitor
                  who is a regulated health professional acceptable to the College (the
                  "Practice Monitor"), and unless the other requirements provided in the
                  Order are fulfilled.  

            (ii)  In addition, Dr. Nahas may not be alone with any patient, for any length
                  of time.

            (iii) At all times, Dr. Nahas shall ensure that the Practice Monitor shall:

                  (a)   Provide reports (as described in the Practice Monitor's
                        undertaking) to the College on at least a monthly basis; 
                  
                  (b)   Remain present at all times during the entire appointment with all
                        patients;
                  
                  (c)   Carefully observe all of Dr. Nahas's Professional Encounters with
                        patients.  It is Dr. Nahas's obligation to ensure that the Practice
                        Monitor's view of all of his Professional Encounters with patients
                        is unobstructed at all times.  
                  
                  (d)   Refrain from performing other functions, except those required in
                        the Practice Monitor's undertaking attached as Appendix "B", while
                        observing Dr. Nahas in all his Professional Encounters with
                        patients;
                  
                  (e)   Maintain a log of all Professional Encounters with patients in the
                        form attached as Appendix "C" (the "Log");
                  
                  (f)   Initial all corresponding entries in the records of patients noted
                        in the Log; and
                  
                  (g)   Submit the original Log to the College on a monthly basis;
                  
            (iv)  Dr. Nahas shall maintain a copy of the Log at all times, and shall make
                  it available to the College upon request.

            Informed Consent for Manual Therapy form

            (v)   Dr. Nahas shall obtain an executed Informed Consent for Manual Therapy,
                  in the form attached at Appendix "D", from every patient to whom he
                  provides manual therapy.  Dr. Nahas shall not provide further manual
                  therapy to those patients to whom he has already provided manual therapy
                  in the past until the patients execute an Informed Consent for Manual
                  Therapy.  Dr. Nahas shall not perform manual therapy on patients on whom
                  he has not previously performed manual therapy until the patients execute
                  an Informed Consent for Manual Therapy.

            Notification of Practice Locations

            (vi)  Dr. Nahas shall inform the College of each and every location that he
                  practices or has privileges including, but not limited to, hospital(s),
                  clinic(s) and office(s), in any jurisdiction (collectively the "Practice
                  Location(s)"), within five (5) days of the Order.  Going forward, he
                  shall inform the College of any and all new Practice Locations within
                  five (5) days of commencing practice at that location.

            Posting a Sign and Translations

            (vii) Dr. Nahas shall post a sign all waiting rooms, examination rooms and
                  consulting rooms, in all of his Practice Locations, in a clearly visible
                  and secure location, in the form attached hereto as Appendix "E" that
                  states: "Dr. Nahas must not provide manipulation, mobilization or massage
                  of the soft tissues and joint structures, including but not limited to
                  myofascial release ("manual therapy"), acupuncture, or injections of any
                  kind, to patients of any age, unless in the continuous presence and under
                  the continuous observation of a practice monitor acceptable to the
                  College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario.  Dr. Nahas must not be
                  alone with any patient. Further information may be found on the College
                  website at www.cpso.on.ca";

            (viii)Dr. Nahas shall post a certified translation(s) in any language(s) in
                  which he provides services, of the sign described in (v) above, in all
                  waiting rooms, examination rooms and consulting rooms, in all of his
                  Practice Locations, in a clearly visible and secure location, in the form
                  attached hereto as Appendix "E"; and

            (ix)  Dr. Nahas shall provide the certified translation(s) described in (vii)
                  above to the College within 30 days of the date of the Order.

            Monitoring

            (x)   Dr. Nahas shall consent to the College's making appropriate enquiries of
                  the Ontario Health Insurance Plan and/or any person or institution who
                  may have relevant information in order for the College to monitor Dr.
                  Nahas's compliance with the terms of the Order and shall promptly sign
                  such consents as may be necessary for the College to obtain information
                  from these persons or institutions;

            (xi)  Dr. Nahas shall submit to, and not interfere with, unannounced
                  inspections of his Practice Locations and to inspections of patient
                  charts by the College and to any other activity the College deems
                  necessary in order to monitor Dr. Nahas's compliance with the terms of
                  the Order;

            (xii) Dr. Nahas shall consent to the College's providing any and all
                  information to the Practice Monitor that the College deems necessary or
                  desirable in order to assist the Practice Monitor in fulfilling their
                  Undertaking and in order to monitor Dr. Nahas's compliance with the terms
                  of the Order;

            (xiii)Dr. Nahas shall consent to all Practice Monitors' disclosing to the
                  College, and to one another, any information relevant to the Order,
                  relevant to the terms of the Practice Monitor's Undertaking and/or
                  relevant for the purposes of monitoring Dr. Nahas's compliance with the
                  Order; and

            (xiv) Dr. Nahas shall consent to the College's providing the Order to any
                  Chief(s) of Staff, or a colleague with similar responsibilities, at any
                  Practice Location where he practices or has privileges ("Chief(s) of
                  Staff"), and to provide said Chief(s) of Staff with any information the
                  College has that led to the Order and/or any information arising from the
                  monitoring of his compliance with the Order.

Concerns Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Source: Other
Active Date: September 13, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Criminal Charges:

Effective May 29, 2015, where a member has been charged with an offence under the Criminal Code of Canada or the Ontario Health Insurance Act and the charge is outstanding and is known to the College, the College By-laws require certain information about the charge to be posted on the register.

The following are outstanding charges against this member, as known to the College, together with the corresponding information:

1 Sexual assault on or about November 7, 2016, at the City of Ottawa, contrary to Section 271 of the Criminal Code of Canada.

Date of charges: August 30, 2018
Place of charges: Ottawa, Ontario
Ottawa Police Service


Source: Other
Active Date: September 13, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Effective December 4, 2014, the College By-laws require members to report to the College any currently existing conditions of release (“bail conditions”) following a charge for a criminal or provincial offence or subsequent to a finding of guilt and pending appeal. The following are conditions of release made against this member:

[August 30, 2018]
1. Reside at the address specified in the Release Undertaking.
2. Not to communicate in any way either directly or indirectly, by any physical, electronic or other means, with individuals specified in the Release Undertaking.
3. Not to have any professional interaction with female patients, except or unless in the presence of a chaperone who is a regulated health professional who is approved by the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario.
4. Post a sign in a visible area of the waiting room and in each examination room stating his name and notification that he is not to have any professional interaction with female patients, except or unless in the present of a chaperone.
5. Immediately notify the police of any change in his practice address.


Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: June 14, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person and Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee (“ICRC”) in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" or a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of ICRC. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s ICRC may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed.

Summaries will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. This posting requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.
Download Full Document (PDF)

The CPSO will be closed for the statutory holiday on Monday, October 14, 2019. We will re-open at 8 a.m. on Tuesday, October 15.