skip to content

Nahas, Richard

CPSO#: 72330

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 21 Nov 2020
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 01 Apr 2021

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English, French, Spanish

Education: University of Toronto, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
942 Merivale Road
Ottawa ON  K1Z 5Z9
Phone: (613) 727-7246
Fax: (613) 727-7247 Electoral District: 07

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Richard Nahas Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 25 2003

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Nahas ( CPSO# 72330 )

Business Address:
942 Merivale Road
Ottawa ON  K1Z 5Z9
Phone Number: (613) 727-7246

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:19 Jun 2001 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. RICHARD NAHAS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NAHAS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Apr 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Apr 2001
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2001
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 13 Jul 2018
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 13 Jul 2018
Terms and conditions amended by Inquiries, Complaints and Repo Effective: 17 May 2019
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Mar 2020
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 21 Jul 2020
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 21 Jul 2020
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Apr 2021

Previous Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 21 Jul 2020
Summary:

FACTS
 
Dr. Richard Nahas is a 46-year-old physician practicing medicine in Ottawa, Ontario. His practice focusses on chronic pain management. In 2001, he obtained his certificate of registration authorizing independent practice from the College and his specialization in family medicine.
 
A. Patient A
 
In the fall of 2016, Patient A sought treatment from Dr. Nahas for chronic low back pain. Patient A had three appointments at Dr. Nahas’ office. On Patient A’s last visit to Dr. Nahas’ office, Dr. Nahas treated Patient A by performing trigger point and peripheral nerve block injections, manual therapy, and placed an acupressure seed on Patient A’s ear.
B. Trigger Point Injections
 
In order to perform the injections, Dr. Nahas required access to Patient A’s exposed back. Prior to performing the trigger point injections, while Patient A was seated on the examination table with her back to Dr. Nahas, Dr. Nahas made efforts to access Patient A’s back by lifting the bottom of her shirt without adequate warning or explanation of what he was doing.
 
Although Dr. Nahas asked Patient A if she required his assistance to lift her shirt, he did not wait for her response before lifting the shirt himself. This conduct caused Patient A to feel upset and uncomfortable.
 
C. Manual Therapy
 
After administering the trigger point injections, Dr. Nahas performed manual therapy on Patient A. This included a manipulation of her left hip and sacroiliac joint, while she was lying supine on the examination table. Patient A was fully clothed during the manual therapy. The manual therapy involved Dr. Nahas placing one of his hands on the inner aspect of Patient A’s upper left thigh, an area he described to Patient A as being “a sensitive area”. Prior to performing the manual therapy, Dr. Nahas did not adequately explain to Patient A what the manual therapy would involve, including placing his hand on her inner upper thigh. This left Patient A confused and upset.
 
D. Acupressure Seed
 
After performing manual therapy, Dr. Nahas placed an acupressure seed on Patient A’s ear. In order to gain access to her ear, Dr. Nahas moved Patient A’s hair away from her ear, without adequate warning or explanation of what he was doing. This conduct made Patient A uncomfortable.
 
1
 
FINDING
 
The Committee found that Dr. Nahas committed an act of professional misconduct under paragraph 1(1)33 of Ontario Regulation 856/93 made under the Medicine Act, 1991, in that he has engaged in an act or omission relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regarding to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional.
 
PENALTY AND COSTS ORDER
 
In its Order issued at the hearing, the Committee ordered with respect to penalty and
costs that:
 
- Dr. Nahas to attend before the panel to be reprimanded.
- The Registrar to suspend Dr. Nahas’ certificate of registration for a period of two (2) months, commencing from September 21, 2020 at 12:01 a.m.
- Registrar to place the following terms, conditions and limitations on Dr. Nahas’ certificate of registration effective immediately:
 
(i) Dr. Nahas shall comply with the College Policy “Closing a Medical Practice”.
 
(ii) Dr. Nahas will participate in the PROBE Ethics & Boundaries Program offered by the Centre for Personalized Education for Professionals, by receiving a passing evaluation or grade, without any condition or qualification. Dr. Nahas will complete the PROBE program within 6 months of the date of this Order, and will provide proof to the College of his completion, including proof of registration and attendance and participant assessment reports, within one (1) month of completing it.
 
- Dr. Nahas to pay costs to the College in the amount of $6,000 within 30 days of the date of the Order.


Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Hearing Date(s): Motion: July 4, 2019 Motion: May 26, 2020 Hearing: July 21, 2020 at 1:00 p.m.

Concerns

Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Active Date: October 21, 2020
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.
Download Full Document (PDF)

 

Source: Compliance and Monitoring Department
Active Date: June 14, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person and Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee (“ICRC”) in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" or a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of ICRC. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s ICRC may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed.

Summaries will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. This posting requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

NOTE: An application has been made for judicial review of this decision by the Divisional Court, Ontario.
Download Full Document (PDF)