skip to content

Ribeiro, Marcos

CPSO#: 85717

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 31 Oct 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Nov 2009

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Faculdade Medicina de Santo Amaro, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 13 Nov 2006 to 04 Feb 2007
PEAP - CF - Respiratory Medicine

University Of Toronto, 05 Feb 2007 to 30 Jun 2007
CF - Respiratory Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
CF - Respiratory Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
CF - Respiratory Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 31 Oct 2009
CF - Respiratory Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Nov 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
CF - Occupational Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
CF - Occupational Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 31 Oct 2011
CF - Occupational Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 13 Nov 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Feb 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Oct 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Nov 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 31 Oct 2011