THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 7:37:51 AM
Ribeiro, Marcos
CPSO#:
85717
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of
31 Oct 2011
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
01 Nov 2009
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Faculdade Medicina de Santo Amaro, 1987
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 13 Nov 2006 to 04 Feb 2007
PEAP - CF - Respiratory Medicine
University of Toronto, 05 Feb 2007 to 30 Jun 2007
CF - Respiratory Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
CF - Respiratory Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
CF - Respiratory Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 31 Oct 2009
CF - Respiratory Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Nov 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
CF - Occupational Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
CF - Occupational Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 31 Oct 2011
CF - Occupational Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 13 Nov 2006 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 05 Feb 2007 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Oct 2009 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Nov 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 31 Oct 2011 |