skip to content

Ren, Jian Zhong

CPSO#: 87761

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 30 May 2008
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 May 2008

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English

Education:Shanghai Medical University, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Scarborough Hospital
General Site
Department of Laboratory Medicine
3050 Lawrence Avenue
Scarborough ON  M1P 2V5
Phone: (416) 438-2911 Ext. 6034
Fax: (416) 431-8123 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Jian Z. Ren Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 30 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Ren ( CPSO# 87761 )

Business Address:
Department of Laboratory Medicine
The Scarborough Hospital
3050 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1P 2V5
Phone Number: (416) 438-2911

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Scarborough Hospital Birchmount Toronto
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective:15 May 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. JIAN ZHONG REN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. REN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2007
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Oct 2007
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Sep 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 May 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 May 2008