THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
26/04/24 7:51:24 AM
Ren, Jian Zhong
CPSO#:
87761
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
13 Apr 2024
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 May 2008
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Chinese, English
Education: Shanghai Medical University, 1985
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Jian Z. Ren Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Dec 27 2022
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anatomical Pathology |
Effective:15 May 2007 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Oct 2007 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 01 Oct 2007 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 30 Sep 2010 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 30 May 2008 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 May 2008 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 13 Apr 2024 |