skip to content

Reid, Robert James Edward

CPSO#: 97728

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 04 Jul 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 04 Jul 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Kingston Health Science Centre
76 Stuart St
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone: (613) 650-3935 Electoral District: 06

Additional Practice Location(s)

166 Division St
Kingston ON  K7L 3M6
Canada
Phone: 613-544-0228
County: County of Frontenac
Electoral District: 06

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:02 Jul 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ROBERT JAMES EDWARD REID may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. REID is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2020 to 30 Jun 2021
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2021 to 30 Jun 2022
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 2014