THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 1:33:34 AM
Reid, Robert James Edward
CPSO#:
97728
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
04 Aug 2023
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
04 Jul 2014
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Queen's University, 2012
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:02 Jul 2014 |
CFPC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2020 to 30 Jun 2021
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2021 to 30 Jun 2022
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2022 to 30 Jun 2023
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2012 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2014 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 04 Jul 2014 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 04 Aug 2023 |