skip to content

Redpath, Stephanie

CPSO#: 87500

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 14 Sep 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 14 Sep 2010

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Glasgow, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Children's Hospital of Eastern ON
Division of Neonatology
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone: (613) 737-7600 Ext. 3291 Electoral District: 07

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Calum Redpath Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 20 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Redpath ( CPSO# 87500 )
Dr. C. Redpath ( CPSO# 87517 )

Business Address:
University of Ottawa Heart Institution
Department of Electrophysiology
40 Ruskin Street
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4W7
Phone Number: (613) 696-7271


Corporation Name: Stephanie Redpath Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 20 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Redpath ( CPSO# 87500 )
Dr. C. Redpath ( CPSO# 87517 )

Business Address:
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario
Division of Neonatology
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone Number: (613) 737-7600


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective:25 Jan 2018 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 29 Aug 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jul 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 14 Sep 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 24 Aug 2017
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 25 Jan 2018

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 25 Jan 2018 Active
             Dr. Stephanie Redpath may practise medicine independently in paediatrics.