THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
25/04/24 1:12:58 AM
Redpath, Stephanie
CPSO#:
87500
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
14 Sep 2010
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
14 Sep 2010
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Glasgow School of Medicine, 1999
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Children's Hospital of Eastern ON
Division of Neonatology
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON K1H 8L1
Phone: (613) 737-7600 Ext. 3291
Electoral District: 07
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
United Kingdom
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario |
Ottawa |
Ottawa Hospital |
Ottawa |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:25 Jan 2018 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Aug 2007 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 29 Aug 2007 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Jul 2008 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 14 Sep 2010 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 24 Aug 2017 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 25 Jan 2018 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 25 Jan 2018 |
|
Active |