skip to content

Rayevskiy, Alexey Olegovich

CPSO#: 87820

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Nov 2007
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 28 Oct 2009

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Russian

Education:Karaganda State Medical Academy, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
595 Bradley Avenue
London ON  N6E 3Z8
Phone: 519-680-1642
Fax: 519-680-0434 Electoral District: 02

Additional Practice Location(s)

1892 Dundas St
London ON  N5W 3G4
Canada
Phone: (519) 455-1100
Fax: 519-455-7400
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Rayevskiy Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 01 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Rayevskiy ( CPSO# 87820 )

Business Address:
595 Bradley Avenue
Suite A
London ON  N6E 3Z8
Phone Number: (519) 680-1642

Business Address:
Unit 111
1 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6C 5Z3
Phone Number: (519) 668-2400

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:27 Oct 2009 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ALEXEY OLEGOVICH RAYEVSKIY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAYEVSKIY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Nov 2007 to 23 Jan 2008
AVP - Family Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 24 Jan 2008 to 31 Oct 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Nov 2008 to 31 Oct 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Nov 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Jan 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Oct 2009