THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
20/04/24 7:32:27 AM
Rayevskiy, Alexey Olegovich
CPSO#:
87820
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Nov 2007
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
28 Oct 2009
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Russian
Education: Karaganda State Medical Academy, 1996
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
595 Bradley Ave
London ON N6E 3Z8
Phone: 5196801642
Fax: 5196800434
Electoral District: 02
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:27 Oct 2009 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ALEXEY OLEGOVICH RAYEVSKIY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAYEVSKIY is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Nov 2007 to 23 Jan 2008
AVP - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 24 Jan 2008 to 31 Oct 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Nov 2008 to 31 Oct 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Nov 2007 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 24 Jan 2008 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 28 Oct 2009 |