skip to content

Ray, Reema

CPSO#: 87819

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Nov 2007
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 28 Oct 2009

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Bengali, English, Hindi

Education:University of Calcutta, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1190 Tecumseh Road East
Windsor ON  N8W 1B4
Phone: (519) 255-9887
Fax: (519) 255-9544 Electoral District: 01

Additional Practice Location(s)

Hotel Dieu Grace Healthcare
Tayfour Campus
1453 Prince Road
Windsor ON  N9C 3Z4
Canada
Phone: (519) 257-5111
County: County of Essex
Electoral District: 01

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Reema Ray Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 23 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Ray ( CPSO# 87819 )

Business Address:
Hotel Dieu Grace Healthcare
1453 Prince Road
Windsor ON  N9C 3Z4
Phone Number: (519) 257-5111

Business Address:
1190 Tecumseh Road East
Windsor ON  N8W 1B4
Phone Number: (519) 255-9887

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hotel Dieu Grace Healthcare,Tayfour Campus Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital,Metropolitan Site Windsor

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:27 Oct 2009 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. REEMA RAY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Western University, 01 Nov 2007 to 23 Jan 2008
AVP - Family Medicine

Western University, 24 Jan 2008 to 31 Oct 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Western University, 01 Nov 2008 to 31 Oct 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Nov 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Jan 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Oct 2009