THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
20/04/24 4:35:52 AM
Ray, Reema
CPSO#:
87819
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Nov 2007
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
28 Oct 2009
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
Bengali, English, Hindi
Education: University of Calcutta, 1999
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
1190 Tecumseh Road East
Windsor ON N8W 1B4
Phone: (519) 255-9887
Fax: (519) 255-9544
Electoral District: 01
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hotel Dieu Grace Healthcare |
Windsor |
Windsor Regional Hospital |
Windsor |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:27 Oct 2009 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. REEMA RAY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAY is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Nov 2007 to 23 Jan 2008
AVP - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 24 Jan 2008 to 31 Oct 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Nov 2008 to 31 Oct 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Nov 2007 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 24 Jan 2008 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 28 Oct 2009 |