skip to content

Ray, Dalia

CPSO#: 31916

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 1978
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 15 May 2018

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Bengali, English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:Nagpur University, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2 Champagne Dr
North York ON  M3J 0K2
Phone: (416) 222-6160 Ext. 268
Fax: (416) 645-1978 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Dalia Ray Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 21 2004

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Ray ( CPSO# 31916 )

Business Address:
2 Champagne Dr
A2
North York ON  M3J 0K2
Phone Number: 416 - 222 - 61

Medical Records Location

Instructions: Records Management Ltd. 1-800-775-0093 or www.recordregistry.ca
Date Received: 06 Jan 2021

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mackenzie Health,Richmond Hill Richmond Hill

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective:04 Jun 1986 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. DALIA RAY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAY is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1978
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Aug 1980
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 09 May 2016
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 09 May 2016
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 May 2018