THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 13:30:13 PM
Ray, Dalia
CPSO#:
31916
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 1978
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
15 May 2018
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
Bengali, English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi
Education: Nagpur University, 1974
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
2 Champagne Dr
North York ON M3J 0K2
Phone: (416) 222-6160 Ext. 268
Fax: (416) 645-1978
Electoral District: 10
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Records Management Ltd.
1-800-775-0093 or www.recordregistry.ca
Date Received: 06 Jan 2021
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Mackenzie Health |
Richmond Hill |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Obstetrics and Gynecology |
Effective:04 Jun 1986 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. DALIA RAY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAY is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1978 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 15 Aug 1980 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 09 May 2016 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 09 May 2016 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 15 May 2018 |