skip to content

Ravindran, Nisha Indrajith

CPSO#: 85429

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Nov 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 01 Nov 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
100 Stokes Street
4th Floor
Toronto ON  M6J 1H4
Phone: (416) 535-8501 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: N. I. Ravindran Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 19 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Ravindran ( CPSO# 85429 )

Business Address:
100 Stokes Street
4th Floor
Toronto ON  M6J 1H4
Phone Number: (416) 535-8501

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health,Queen Street Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective:30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. NISHA INDRAJITH RAVINDRAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAVINDRAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Aug 2006 to 23 Oct 2006
AVP - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 24 Oct 2006 to 31 Jul 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Aug 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 31 Jul 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University Of Toronto, 01 Aug 2008 to 31 Jul 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University Of Toronto, 01 Aug 2009 to 31 Jul 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University Of Toronto, 01 Aug 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Oct 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Nov 2011