THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
18/04/24 19:23:20 PM
Ravindran, Nisha Indrajith
CPSO#:
85429
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Nov 2011
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
01 Nov 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland Sch, 2006
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
100 Stokes Street
4th Floor
Toronto ON M6J 1H4
Phone: (416) 535-8501
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:30 Jun 2011 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. NISHA INDRAJITH RAVINDRAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAVINDRAN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Aug 2006 to 23 Oct 2006
AVP - Psychiatry
University of Ottawa, 24 Oct 2006 to 31 Jul 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry
University of Ottawa, 01 Aug 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 31 Jul 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2008 to 31 Jul 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2009 to 31 Jul 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Aug 2006 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 25 Oct 2006 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2011 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 01 Nov 2011 |