skip to content

Ravenscroft, Alan Keith

CPSO#: 21750

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 07 Sep 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 07 Sep 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Edinburgh, 1959

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: DocuDavit Solutions 28 Eugene Street Toronto ON M6B 3Z4 website: http://www.docudavit.com tel: 416.781.9083 fax: 1.888.297.9338 toll free: 1.888.781.9083
Instructions: see above
Date Received: 16 Feb 2011

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Feb 1966
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Dec 1968
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 25 Feb 2002
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 25 Feb 2002
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jan 2003
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 03 Jan 2011
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 03 Jan 2011
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 07 Sep 2011