THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 18:55:10 PM
Ravenscroft, Alan Keith
CPSO#:
21750
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of
07 Sep 2011
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
03 Jan 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Edinburgh, 1959
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:see above
DocuDavit Solutions
28 Eugene Street
Toronto ON M6B 3Z4
website: http://www.docudavit.com
tel: 416.781.9083
fax: 1.888.297.9338
toll free: 1.888.781.9083
Date Received: 16 Feb 2011
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate |
Effective: 01 Feb 1966 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 11 Dec 1968 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 25 Feb 2002 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 25 Feb 2002 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 16 Jan 2003 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 03 Jan 2011 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 03 Jan 2011 |
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership |
Expiry: 07 Sep 2011 |