skip to content

Rau, Jill Camille

CPSO#: 93438

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2017
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 10 Jan 2017

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective:15 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2012 to 21 Dec 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 22 Dec 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2013 to 21 Dec 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 22 Dec 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2014 to 21 Dec 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 22 Dec 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2015 to 21 Dec 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 22 Dec 2015 to 04 Mar 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 05 Mar 2016 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2016 to 21 Sep 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 22 Sep 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
CF - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 10 Jan 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 10 Jan 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2017