THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
20/04/24 7:58:00 AM
Rau, Jill Camille
CPSO#:
93438
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of
30 Jun 2017
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
10 Jan 2017
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 2010
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Neurology |
Effective:15 Jun 2017 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2012 to 21 Dec 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 22 Dec 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2013 to 21 Dec 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 22 Dec 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2014 to 21 Dec 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 22 Dec 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2015 to 21 Dec 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 22 Dec 2015 to 04 Mar 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 05 Mar 2016 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2016 to 21 Sep 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 22 Sep 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
CF - Neurology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2010 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 10 Jan 2017 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 10 Jan 2017 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 30 Jun 2017 |