skip to content

Ramji, AlKarim Moizali

CPSO#: 91190

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 30 Jul 2019
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jul 2019

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Alberta Faculty of Medicin, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
Division of General Surgery
50 Charlton Ave E
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone: 905-522-1155 Ext. 35144 Electoral District: 04

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective:30 Jun 2019 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ALKARIM MOIZALI RAMJI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAMJI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 28 Feb 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Mar 2018 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 31 Mar 2019
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Apr 2019 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Aug 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
CF - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2020 to 31 Dec 2020
CF - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2020 to 30 Apr 2021
CF - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2021 to 31 Jul 2021
CF - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2019
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jul 2019