THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 18:13:09 PM
Ramji, AlKarim Moizali
CPSO#:
91190
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
30 Jul 2019
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jul 2019
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicin, 2009
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
Division of General Surgery
50 Charlton Ave E
Hamilton ON L8N 4A6
Phone: 905-522-1155 Ext. 35144
Electoral District: 04
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton |
Hamilton |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Surgery |
Effective:30 Jun 2019 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ALKARIM MOIZALI RAMJI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAMJI is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 28 Feb 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Mar 2018 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 31 Mar 2019
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Apr 2019 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Aug 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
CF - General Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2020 to 31 Dec 2020
CF - General Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2020 to 30 Apr 2021
CF - General Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2021 to 31 Jul 2021
CF - General Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Nov 2022 to 30 Jun 2023
CF - General Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2023 to 31 Oct 2023
CF - General Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2019 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jul 2019 |