skip to content

Raju, Dharmapaul Lakshmana

CPSO#: 87756

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 04 Jun 2019
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 19 Jun 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Saskatchewan College of Me, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



British Columbia
USA - Arkansas
USA - California
USA - Georgia
USA - Texas

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:06 May 2003 RCPSC Specialist
Nephrology Effective:19 Sep 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Sep 2007
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jun 2014
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 04 Jun 2019