THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
18/04/24 19:31:17 PM
Raju, Dharmapaul Lakshmana
CPSO#:
87756
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
04 Jun 2019
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
19 Jun 2014
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Saskatchewan College of Me, 1998
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
British Columbia
USA - Arkansas
USA - California
USA - Georgia
USA - Texas
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:06 May 2003 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Nephrology |
Effective:19 Sep 2007 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 28 Sep 2007 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2012 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 19 Jun 2014 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 04 Jun 2019 |