skip to content

Monson, Rochelle Leigh

CPSO#: 70310

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 1996
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 02 Jun 2004

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: Mandelcorn, Rochelle Leigh (used until: 17 May 2001 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education: University of Toronto, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
200 Windflower Gate Unit 13
Woodbridge ON  L4L 9I3
Phone: 9058562100
Fax: 9058562101 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

1st Floor
2888 Bathurst St
Toronto ON  M6B 4H6
Canada
Phone: (416) 256-0600
Fax: (416) 256-0602
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Rochelle Monson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 24 2022

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Monson ( CPSO# 70310 )

Business Address:
700-200 Windflower Gate
Woodbridge ON  L4L 9L3

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:31 Dec 2000 RCPSC Specialist
Dermatology Effective:04 Jun 2004 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ROCHELLE LEIGH MONSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MONSON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 31 Dec 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2000 to 31 Dec 2000
PostGrad Yr 4 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 5 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 31 Dec 2002
PostGrad Yr 5 - Clinician Investigator

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2003 to 31 Mar 2003
PostGrad Yr 5 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Apr 2003 to 30 Sep 2003
PostGrad Yr 5 - Clinician Investigator

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2003 to 31 Dec 2003
PostGrad Yr 5 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2004 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 5 - Clinician Investigator

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 31 Jan 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - Clinician Investigator

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jun 2004