skip to content

Comley, Rebecca Ann

CPSO#: 73622

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 1999
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 15 May 2002

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education: McMaster University, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
194 Terrace Hill St
Brantford ON  N3R 1G7
Phone: (519)753-4937 Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Drs. Comley and Finley Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 02 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Comley ( CPSO# 73622 )
Dr. C. Finley ( CPSO# 85803 )

Business Address:
Brantford General Hospital
Department of Emergency Medicine
200 Terrace Hill Street
Brantford ON  N3R 1G9
Phone Number: (519) 751-5544

Business Address:
St Joseph's Healthcare
50 Charlton Avenue East
Room T2105H
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone Number: (905) 522-1155

Business Address:
Wallace Family Health Centre
1200 Fourth Avenue
St Catharines ON  L2S 0A9
Phone Number: (905) 378-4647

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Brant Community Healthcare System Brantford

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:19 Jun 2001 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective:01 Dec 2002 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. REBECCA ANN COMLEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COMLEY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Queen's University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 May 2002