skip to content

Qureshi, Abdul Majid

CPSO#: 25468

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 09 Jan 2017
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 09 Jan 2017

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Urdu

Education:University of Birmingham, 1963

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Unit 100 751 Victoria Street Kitchener ON N2M 5N4 Tel: 519-570-2198
Date Received: 18 Jan 2017

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective:14 Nov 1978 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Feb 1971
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Aug 1971
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Feb 1973
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 09 Jan 2017