THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 9:40:59 AM
Qureshi, Abdul Majid
CPSO#:
25468
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
09 Jan 2017
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
16 Feb 1973
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Urdu
Education: University of Birmingham, 1963
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Unit 100
751 Victoria Street
Kitchener ON N2M 5N4
Tel: 519-570-2198
Date Received: 18 Jan 2017
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Diagnostic Radiology |
Effective:14 Nov 1978 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate |
Effective: 18 Feb 1971 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 26 Aug 1971 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 16 Feb 1973 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 09 Jan 2017 |