skip to content

Quirt, Ian Chesney

CPSO#: 22989

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 31 Oct 2019
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 31 Oct 2019

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1969

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Michael Garron Hospital
825 Coxwell Ave
Toronto ON  M4C 3E7
Phone: (416) 469-3325
Fax: (416) 469-8221 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. J. Meharchand Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 03 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. I. Quirt ( CPSO# 22989 )
Dr. J. Meharchand ( CPSO# 33394 )

Business Address:
825 Coxwell Avenue
K2 Wing
Toronto ON  M4C 3E7
Phone Number: (416) 469-3325

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Michael Garron Hospital - Toronto East Health Network Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:06 Nov 1974 RCPSC Specialist
Hematology Effective:20 Nov 1974 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. IAN CHESNEY QUIRT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. QUIRT is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Jul 1969
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jul 1970
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 27 Aug 2018
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 13 Dec 2018
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 31 Oct 2019
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Oct 2019