THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
18/04/24 22:50:37 PM
Quirt, Ian Chesney
CPSO#:
22989
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
30 Jun 2023
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
31 Oct 2019
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1969
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. J. Meharchand Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 17 2021
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:06 Nov 1974 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Hematology |
Effective:20 Nov 1974 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 25 Jul 1969 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 10 Jul 1970 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2010 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 27 Aug 2018 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 13 Dec 2018 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 31 Oct 2019 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 31 Oct 2019 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2023 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jul 2023 |