skip to content

Puopolo, Laura Katherine

CPSO#: 88840

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 03 Dec 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 03 Dec 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
700 Coronation Blvd.
Cambridge ON  N1R 3G2
Phone: (519) 621-2330
Fax: (519) 740-4938 Electoral District: 03

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Laura Puopolo Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 21 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Puopolo ( CPSO# 88840 )

Business Address:
115 Delhi Street
Guelph ON  N1E 4J4
Phone Number: (519) 822-5350

Business Address:
Cambridge Memorial Hospital
700 Coronation Boulevard
Cambridge ON  N1R 3G2
Phone Number: (519) 621-2330

Business Address:
200 - 50 Sportsworld Crossing
Kitchener ON  N2P 0A4
Phone Number: (519) 650-2777

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Cambridge Memorial Hospital Cambridge
Guelph General Hospital Guelph

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Nov 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. LAURA KATHERINE PUOPOLO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PUOPOLO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 10 Nov 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 11 Nov 2011 to 10 Nov 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 11 Nov 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Nov 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Nov 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Dec 2013