THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
25/04/24 2:42:04 AM
Puopolo, Laura Katherine
CPSO#:
88840
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
03 Dec 2013
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
03 Dec 2013
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 2008
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
700 Coronation Blvd.
Cambridge ON N1R 3G2
Phone: (519) 621-2330
Fax: (519) 740-4938
Electoral District: 03
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Cambridge Memorial Hospital |
Cambridge |
Grand River Hospital Corporation |
Kitchener |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:30 Nov 2013 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. LAURA KATHERINE PUOPOLO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PUOPOLO is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 10 Nov 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 11 Nov 2011 to 10 Nov 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 11 Nov 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Nov 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2008 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Nov 2013 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 03 Dec 2013 |