skip to content

Pruzanski, Waldemar

CPSO#: 21447

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 10 Aug 2020
EXPIRY DATE
10 Aug 2020
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 02 Jul 1968

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Date of Death: 9-Sep-2020

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hebrew, Polish, Russian

Education:The Hebrew University, 1956

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:20 Nov 1968 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Dec 1966
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 1968
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 10 Aug 2020