THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 15:41:04 PM
Pruzanski, Waldemar
CPSO#:
21447
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
10 Aug 2020
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
02 Jul 1968
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Date of Death:
9-Sep-2020
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Hebrew, Polish, Russian
Education: The Hebrew University-Hadassah Medical S, 1956
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:20 Nov 1968 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Dec 1966 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 02 Jul 1968 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 10 Aug 2020 |