skip to content

Primeau, Valerie

CPSO#: 89492

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 06 Sep 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 06 Sep 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Université de Sherbrooke Faculté de Méde, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
North Bay Regional Health Centre
50 College Drive
North Bay ON  P1B 5A4
Phone: (705) 474-8600 Electoral District: 08

Additional Practice Location(s)

Community Counselling Centre
361 McIntyre Street East
North Bay ON  P1B1C9
Canada
Phone: 7054726515 Ext. 231
Fax: 7054724582
County: Territorial District of Nipissing
Electoral District: 08

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Valerie Primeau Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 25 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. V. Primeau ( CPSO# 89492 )

Business Address:
North Bay Regional Health Centre
50 College Drive
North Bay ON  P1B 5A4
Phone Number: (705) 474-8600

Business Address:
Community Counselling Centre
361 McIntyre Street East
North Bay ON  P1B 1C9
Phone Number: (705) 472-6515

Business Address:
North Bay Regional Health Centre
120 King West
North Bay ON  P1B 5Z7
Phone Number: (705) 494-3050

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North Bay Regional Health Centre North Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective:21 Jul 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. VALERIE PRIMEAU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PRIMEAU is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 21 Jul 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 22 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 21 Jul 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 22 Jul 2011 to 21 Jul 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 22 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 21 Jul 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 21 Jul 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Sep 2013