THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
05/05/24 20:45:13 PM
Primeau, Valerie
CPSO#:
89492
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
06 Sep 2013
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
06 Sep 2013
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: Université de Sherbrooke Faculté de Méde, 2008
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
North Bay Regional Health Centre
50 College Drive
North Bay ON P1B 5A4
Phone: (705) 474-8600
Electoral District: 08
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
North Bay Regional Health Centre |
North Bay |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:21 Jul 2013 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. VALERIE PRIMEAU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PRIMEAU is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 21 Jul 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry
University of Ottawa, 22 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 21 Jul 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry
University of Ottawa, 22 Jul 2011 to 21 Jul 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry
University of Ottawa, 22 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 21 Jul 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2008 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 21 Jul 2013 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 06 Sep 2013 |