skip to content

Prigozhikh, Viachislav

CPSO#: 87649

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 29 Aug 2007
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 29 Aug 2007

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Russian

Education:Irkutsk State Medical University, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Champagne Centre
Unit B10
2 Champagne Drive
Toronto ON  M3J 2C5
Phone: (416) 222-6160 Ext. 225
Fax: (416) 645-1979 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Prigozhikh Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 13 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. V. Prigozhikh ( CPSO# 87649 )

Business Address:
Champagne Centre
Unit B10
2 Champagne Drive
Toronto ON  M3J 2C5
Phone Number: (416) 222-6160

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective:29 Aug 2007 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 29 Aug 2007
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 29 Aug 2007
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 28 Feb 2009
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 31 Oct 2007
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 19 Nov 2008
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 21 Nov 2008

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 19 Nov 2008 Active
             1.    Dr.   Viachislav   Prigozhikh  may  practise  medicine  independently  in
                  neurology, only.