THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
26/04/24 19:55:11 PM
Prigozhikh, Viachislav
CPSO#:
87649
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
29 Aug 2007
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
29 Aug 2007
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Russian
Education: Irkutsk State Medical University, 1985
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Champagne Centre
Unit B10
2 Champagne Drive
Toronto ON M3J 2C5
Phone: (416) 222-6160 Ext. 225
Fax: (416) 645-1979
Electoral District: 10
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Neurology |
Effective:29 Aug 2007 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 29 Aug 2007 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 29 Aug 2007 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 28 Feb 2009 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 31 Oct 2007 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 19 Nov 2008 |
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. |
Effective: 21 Nov 2008 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 19 Nov 2008 |
|
Active |