skip to content

Preradovic, Nikola

CPSO#: 25406

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 04 Jan 2018
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 04 Jan 2018

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Serbian

Education:University of Belgrade, 1961

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Instructions: Patients who are looking to obtain a copy of thier medical record may contact: Rebecca Medical Walk-In Clinic 170 Rebecca Street Oakville ON L6K 1J6 Tel: 905-849-0986
Date Received: 02 Jan 2018

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1973 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Jan 1971
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jan 1973
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 04 Jan 2018