THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
24/04/24 10:44:11 AM
Preradovic, Nikola
CPSO#:
25406
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of
04 Jan 2018
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
04 Jan 1973
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Serbian
Education: University of Belgrade, 1961
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Patients who are looking to obtain a copy of thier medical record may contact:
Rebecca Medical Walk-In Clinic
170 Rebecca Street
Oakville ON L6K 1J6
Tel: 905-849-0986
Date Received: 02 Jan 2018
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:01 Jul 1973 |
CFPC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 06 Jan 1971 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 04 Jan 1973 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 04 Jan 2018 |